Williams, Kelly Marie (CPSO#: 81058)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Nov 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Georgetown ED
1 Princess Anne Drive
Georgetown ON  L7G 2B8
Phone: (905) 873-0111
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Williams-Pannell Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 17 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Williams ( CPSO# 81058 )
Dr. D. Pannell ( CPSO# 86882 )

Business Address:
Georgetown Hospital
1 Princess Anne Drive
Georgetown ON  L7G 2B8
Phone Number: (905) 873-0111

Business Address:
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation,Georgetown Hospital Georgetown

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 21 Jun 2006 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 26 Oct 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KELLY MARIE WILLIAMS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WILLIAMS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Nov 2006