Williams, Kenneth John (CPSO#: 31697)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 03 Jul 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 03 Jul 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ken Williams Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 17 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Williams ( CPSO# 31697 )

Business Address:
Sundridge Medical Centre
P.O. Box 750
5 Park Street
Sundridge ON  P0A 1Z0
Phone Number: (705) 384-5258

Medical Records Location

Address: Sundridge Medical Centre 5 Park Street Sundridge, ON P0A 1Z0
Date Received: 04 Jul 2018

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1980
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 Jul 2018