Williams, Kona Kristen Chant (CPSO#: 91025)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jan 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Jan 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
25 Morton Shulman Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B1
Phone: 647-329-1873
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 20 Dec 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Forensic Pathology Effective: 20 Dec 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KONA KRISTEN CHANT WILLIAMS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WILLIAMS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 20 Dec 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Ottawa, 21 Dec 2010 to 20 Dec 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 20 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Ottawa, 21 Dec 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 20 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Ottawa, 21 Dec 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 20 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 21 Dec 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 6 - Forensic Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 20 Dec 2015
PostGrad Yr 6 - Forensic Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Dec 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jan 2016