Williams, Lori-Anne Bernadette (CPSO#: 91026)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Dec 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Grand River Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone: 5197494300 Ext. 2313
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Lori-Anne Williams Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 13 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Williams ( CPSO# 91026 )

Business Address:
Grand River Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone Number: (519) 749-4300

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 31 Dec 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LORI-ANNE BERNADETTE WILLIAMS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WILLIAMS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Dec 2014