Williams, Robert Christopher (CPSO#: 73981)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Caroline Family Health Team
3305 Harvester Road
Suites 15-20
Burlington ON  L7N 3N2
Phone: (905) 632-8007
Fax: (905) 681-6341
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. R. Christopher Williams Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 28 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Williams ( CPSO# 73981 )

Business Address:
Caroline Family Health Team
Units 15 - 20
3305 Harvester Road
Burlington ON  L7N 3N2
Phone Number: (905) 632-8007


Corporation Name: Chalklin Duncan Gallaccio Pintea Wallik Walsh Williams Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 28 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Walsh ( CPSO# 90905 )
Dr. R. Williams ( CPSO# 73981 )
Dr. D. Wallik ( CPSO# 53982 )
Dr. D. Pintea ( CPSO# 78124 )
Dr. G. Duncan ( CPSO# 66390 )
Dr. L. Chalklin ( CPSO# 55848 )
Dr. A. Gallaccio ( CPSO# 82590 )

Business Address:
Units 15 - 20
3305 Harvester Road
Burlington ON  L7N 3N2
Phone Number: (905) 632-8007

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2001 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT CHRISTOPHER WILLIAMS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WILLIAMS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2001