Williams, Taryn Melissa (CPSO#: 86350)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: McKnight, Taryn Melissa (used until: 11 Jul 2007 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hespeler Medical Clinic
B12
350 Conestoga Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 7L7
Phone: (519) 629-4615
Fax: (519) 629-4630
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Taryn Williams Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 05 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Williams ( CPSO# 86350 )

Business Address:
Hespler Medical Clinic
Suite B12
350 Conestoga Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 7L7
Phone Number: (519) 629-4615

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 25 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TARYN MELISSA WILLIAMS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WILLIAMS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2009