Williamson, Amanda Frances (CPSO#: 90992)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Dec 2014

Summary

Former Name: Pecore, Amanda Frances (used until: 23 Sep 2009 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Lorraine Wing
Tower C
201 Deacon Street
Pembroke ON  K8A 2J6
Phone: (613) 732-3675 Ext. 7209
Fax: (613) 732-2085
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Williamson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 22 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Williamson ( CPSO# 90992 )

Business Address:
201 Deacon Street
Pembroke ON  K8A 2J6
Phone Number: (613) 732-3675

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Pembroke Regional Hospital Pembroke

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 14 Dec 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AMANDA FRANCES WILLIAMSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WILLIAMSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 14 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 15 Dec 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 15 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Dec 2014