Willsie, Cheryl Lynn (CPSO#: 91695)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Jul 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Jul 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Bluewater Health
89 Normal Street
Sarnia
Sarnia ON  N7T 6S3
Phone: 519-464-4400
Electoral District: 01

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bluewater Health Sarnia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHERYL LYNN WILLSIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WILLSIE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 06 Jul 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 07 Jul 2010 to 06 Jul 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 07 Jul 2011 to 06 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 07 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 06 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 07 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 2014