Wilson, Anne (CPSO#: 93715)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
5233 Stanley Avenue
Suite 10
Niagara Falls ON  L2E 7C2
Phone: (905) 295-4367
Fax: (905) 295-7914
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Anne Wilson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 13 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Wilson ( CPSO# 93715 )

Business Address:
10 - 5233 Stanely Avenue
Niagara Falls ON  L2E 7C2
Phone Number: (905) 295-4367

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANNE WILSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WILSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 07 Jul 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 08 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 2012