Wilson, Chantelle Nicole (CPSO#: 74930)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Mar 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
P O Box 219
70 Meredith Street
Gore Bay ON  P0P 1H0
Phone: (705) 282-2262
Fax: (705) 282-2370
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Chantelle Wilson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 17 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Wilson ( CPSO# 74930 )

Business Address:
70 Meredith Street
P O Box 219
Gore Bay ON  P0P 1H0
Phone Number: (705) 282-2262

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Manitoulin Health Centre Little Current
Manitoulin Health Centre,Mindemoya Site Mindemoya

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2002 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHANTELLE NICOLE WILSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WILSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Mar 2003