Wilson, Colin Graham (CPSO#: 84480)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Jan 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Jan 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 105
797 Princess Street
Kingston ON  K7L 1G1
Phone: (613) 549-0464
Fax: (613) 549-0490
Electoral District: 06
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

500A Gardiners Rd
Kingston ON  K7M 7W9
Canada
Phone: (613) 389-5974
Fax: (613) 389-0804
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Banh and Wilson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 17 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Wilson ( CPSO# 84480 )
Dr. T. Banh ( CPSO# 79141 )

Business Address:
500 Gardiners Road
Suite A
Kingston ON  K7M 7W9
Phone Number: (613) 389-5974

Business Address:
Suite 105
797 Princess Street
Kingston ON  K7L 1G1
Phone Number: (613) 549-0464

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 14 Dec 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. COLIN GRAHAM WILSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WILSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 02 Oct 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology

Queen's University, 03 Oct 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 13 Dec 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 14 Dec 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 19 Dec 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Dec 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jan 2012