Wilson, James Arthur (CPSO#: 73564)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Jul 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
425 N Cobb Street
Milledgeville GA  31061
United States
Phone: (478) 454-1034
Fax: (478) 454-1114

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Georgia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JAMES ARTHUR WILSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WILSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 2005