Wilson, Jennifer Lyn Clandinan (CPSO#: 95844)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Sep 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Windsor Regional Hospital
Ouellette Campus
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N9A 1E1
Phone: (519) 254-5577
Electoral District: 01
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9
Canada
Phone: 519-254-5577
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jennifer Lyn Clandinan Wilson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 09 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Wilson ( CPSO# 95844 )

Business Address:
Windsor Regional Hospital
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N9A 1E1
Phone Number: (519) 973-4411

Business Address:
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9
Phone Number: (519) 254-5577

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 19 Sep 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JENNIFER LYN CLANDINAN WILSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WILSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 13 Dec 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 14 Dec 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 19 Sep 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Sep 2016