Wilson, Joslyn Vernice (CPSO#: 78098)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Anaesthesia)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 May 2007
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2016
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017