Wilson, Meghan Dawn (CPSO#: 93041)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Mar 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
33 Canadian Forces Health Services
26 Somme Ave
CFB Kingston
Kingston ON  K7K 7B4
Phone: (613) 541-5010 Ext. 5508
Electoral District: 06
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Queen's Department of Family Medici
220 Bagot St
Kingston ON  K7L 5E9
Canada
Phone: (613) 533 9300
Fax: (613) 544 9899
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M.D. Wilson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 30 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Wilson ( CPSO# 93041 )

Business Address:
33 Canadian Health Forces, 26 Somme Avenue
Services Unit
Kingston ON  K7K 7B4
Phone Number: (613) 541-5010

Business Address:
Queen's Family Health
220 Bagot Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5E9
Phone Number: (613) 533-9303

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 27 Feb 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MEGHAN DAWN WILSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WILSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 12 Mar 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 13 Mar 2012 to 11 Mar 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Mar 2013