Wilson, Murray Bruce (CPSO#: 55196)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Mar 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 17 Nov 2016

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Portuguese, Spanish

Education:McGill University, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
45 Grist Mill Road
Unit 3
Holland Landing ON  L9N 1M7
Phone: (905) 775-3900
Fax: 905-235-7077
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Murray B. Wilson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 11 2018

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Apr 1985
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 13 Jan 2012
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 17 Nov 2016
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Discipline Committee Effective: 17 Nov 2016
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 17 Nov 2016
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 17 Mar 2017

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Discipline Committee Effective: 17 Nov 2016 Active View Details [+]
            As from November 17, 2016, by order of the Discipline Committee of the College
            of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, the following terms, conditions and
            limitations are imposed on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Murray
            Bruce Wilson:


                               UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                            ("Undertaking")
                                                  of
                                        DR. MURRAY BRUCE WILSON
                                            ("Dr. Wilson")
                                                  to
                           THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                            (the "College")




            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   I, Dr. Wilson, certificate of registration number 55196, am a member of
                  the College.  

            B.    UNDERTAKING AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENTS

            (2)   I, Dr. Wilson, understand and agree that I am bound by the terms of this
                  Undertaking from the date on which I sign it.

            (3)   Practice Restrictions

                  (a)   I, Dr. Wilson, undertake to the College that, effective
                        immediately, I shall not engage in any professional encounters with
                        female patients in any jurisdiction, unless the patient encounter
                        takes place in the presence of a monitor who is a regulated health
                        professional acceptable to the College (the "Practice Monitor"),
                        and unless the other requirements provided in this Undertaking are
                        fulfilled. For further clarity, I understand that I may not be
                        alone with any female patient, for any length of time, during any
                        professional encounter, whether or not the parent or guardian of
                        the patient is also present.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Wilson, acknowledge that I have reviewed the Practice
                        Monitor's undertaking, attached hereto as Appendix "A" and
                        understand what is required of the Practice Monitor including, but
                        not limited to:
                  
                        1.    providing reports (as described in the Practice Monitor's
                              undertaking) to the College on at least a monthly basis; 
                  
                        2.    remaining in the examination or consulting room at all times
                              during all professional encounters with all female patients; 
                        3.    carefully observing all of my physical examinations of all of
                              my female patients, including but not limited to internal
                              examinations of female patients.  I further acknowledge my
                              obligation to ensure the Practice Monitor's view of all of my
                              physical examinations of female patients is unobstructed at
                              all times; 
                  
                        4.    maintaining a log of all female patient encounters in the
                              form attached to this Undertaking as Appendix "B" (the
                              "Log");
                  
                        5.    initialing all corresponding entries in the records of
                              patients noted in the Log; and
                  
                        6.    submitting the original Log to the College on a monthly
                              basis.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Wilson, undertake and agree to maintain my own copy of the
                        Log at all times, and to make it available to the College upon
                        request. 
                  
            (4)   I, Dr. Wilson, undertake to inform the College of each and every location
                  that I practice, including, but not limited to, hospital(s), clinic(s)
                  and office(s), in any jurisdiction (collectively my "Practice
                  Location(s)"), within 15 days of executing this Undertaking.
                  Henceforward, I further undertake to inform the College of any and all
                  new Practice Locations within 15 days of commencing practice at that
                  location.

            (5)   Posting a Sign

                  (a)   I, Dr. Wilson, undertake to the College that, effective
                        immediately, I shall post a sign in the waiting rooms of all my
                        Practice Locations and in each of my examination rooms, in a
                        clearly visible location, attached hereto as Appendix "C" that
                        states: "Dr. Wilson will only have encounters with female patients,
                        of any age, in the presence of [insert name of monitor], who is a
                        practice monitor approved by the College of Physicians and Surgeons
                        of Ontario.  Dr. Wilson will not be alone with any female patient
                        unless [insert name of monitor] in the examination or consultation
                        room."
                  
            (6)   I, Dr. Wilson, acknowledge that a breach of any term of this Undertaking
                  may constitute an act of professional misconduct and may result in a
                  referral of specified allegations to the Discipline Committee of the
                  College (the "Discipline Committee").

            (7)   I, Dr. Wilson, acknowledge that I have read and understand the terms and
                  conditions provided in this Undertaking, and that I have obtained
                  independent legal counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or
                  have waived my right to do so.




            C.    CONSENT

            (8)   I, Dr. Wilson, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                  appropriate enquiries of the Ontario Health Insurance Plan and/or any
                  person or institution who may have relevant information, in order for the
                  College to monitor my compliance with the terms of this Undertaking.

            (9)   I, Dr. Wilson, consent to submit and not interfere with, unannounced
                  inspections of my Practice Locations and to the inspection of patient
                  charts by the College and to any other activity the College deems
                  necessary in order to monitor my compliance with the terms of this
                  Undertaking.

            (10)  I, Dr. Wilson, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the
                  following information to all Practice Monitors:

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                        of, my practice; and 
                  
                  (c)   any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
                        this Undertaking.
                  
            (11)  I, Dr. Wilson, give my irrevocable consent to all Practice Monitors to
                  disclose to the College, and to one another, any information:

                  (a)   relevant to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   relevant to the terms of the Practice Monitor's undertaking set out
                        at Appendix "A"; and/or
                  
                  (c)   relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this
                        Undertaking.
                  
            (12)  I, Dr. Wilson, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide this
                  Undertaking to any Chief(s) of Staff, or a colleague with similar
                  responsibilities approved by the College, at any hospital or Practice
                  Location where I practice or have privileges ("Chief(s) of Staff"), and
                  to provide said Chief(s) of Staff with any information the College has
                  that led to the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or
                  any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this
                  Undertaking.

            (13)  I, Dr. Wilson, consent to certain terms of this Undertaking being deemed
                  to be specified terms, conditions and limitations imposed upon my
                  certificate of registration for the purposes of section 23 of the Health
                  Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2 to the Regulated Health
                  Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as amended.  Specifically, the
                  following shall be subject to this provision: 

                        Effective immediately, Dr.Wilson shall not engage in any
                        professional encounters with female patients of any age, in any
                        jurisdiction, unless the patient encounter takes place in the
                        presence of a female regulated health professional approved by the
                        College, and unless the other requirements provided in his
                        Undertaking with the College are fulfilled.  For further clarity,
                        Dr. Wilson may not be alone with any female patient, during any
                        professional encounter.  
                  
                        I understand that such specified terms, conditions and limitations
                        shall be information on the College's Register that is available to
                        the public.

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 16 Nov 2016
Summary:

On November 16, 2016, the Discipline Committee of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of 
Ontario found that Dr. Murray Bruce Wilson has committed an act of professional misconduct in 
that he has engaged in an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard 
to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, 
dishonourable, or unprofessional. 
 
Dr. Wilson is a family physician who has practised in Bradford, Ontario since 1985. Patient A 
was Dr. Wilson’s patient beginning when she was a young child.  
 
In December 2004, when she was in her teens, Patient A attended at Dr. Wilson’s office because 
she was experiencing pain after having had intercourse earlier that day (dyspareunia). Her 
medical record indicates that on that day she was also complaining of dysmenorrhea and 
menorrhagia, as well as lower back pain of two months’ duration, which was aggravated by 
bending. At a previous appointment, Dr Wilson had performed a breast examination and 
identified a lump that should be monitored.  
 
At the December 2004 appointment, Dr. Wilson performed a clinically-indicated physical 
examination on Patient A, which included an examination of the chest, breasts, cardiovascular 
system, abdomen, and pelvis. Dr. Wilson took a vaginal swab, provided Patient A with a 
requisition for a urine test, and ordered a pelvic ultrasound. Dr. Wilson documented the 
examination in the patient chart.  
 
Dr. Wilson also assessed Patient A’s lower back at the appointment, which included asking that 
she stand and bend to 90 degrees. This assessment was clinically indicated and documented in 
the patient chart. Dr. Wilson noted in the chart that his impression was that Patient A had a 
lumbar strain.  
 
Patient A was confused and distressed by this appointment as a result of Dr. Wilson’s conduct 
during the appointment, which included the following: 
   -  Dr. Wilson did not provide Patient A with a gown, but only with a drape, which was 
      inadequate for the examinations performed. Patient A found it hard to cover herself 
      sufficiently throughout the appointment. This left her feeling exposed and vulnerable.  
   -  Dr. Wilson did not adequately explain the pelvic and breast examinations that he 
      conducted to Patient A to obtain her informed consent. Patient A did not understand the 
      purpose and steps involved.  
   -  Although Dr. Wilson asked Patient A for sexual information relevant to the pain she was 
      experiencing after intercourse, he did not explain the clinical basis for his questions. He 
      asked her whether it hurt and how it felt when her boyfriend “went deep,” and repeated 
      the word “deep” several times. Patient A felt very uncomfortable.  
   -  Dr. Wilson directed Patient A to bend over with her back to him, without explaining the 
      clinical reason or seeking her consent. Patient A bent over as directed, but had only the 
      drape to hold in place at her front, while her back (which was towards Dr. Wilson) was 
      fully exposed, including her buttocks.  Patient A did not understand the purpose of this 
      examination and felt shocked and violated.  
 
As a result, Patient A experienced great discomfort during the appointment. She returned to see 
Dr. Wilson on several more occasions but was not comfortable with him. The experience made 
her more reluctant to seek medical care in general. In 2013, Patient A considered the continued 
impact of her experience with Dr. Wilson. Subsequently, Patient A decided to report her 
experience to the College.  
 
Dr. Wilson is subject to an undertaking to the College into which he entered on January 13, 
2012. It requires Dr. Wilson to have a practice monitor who is a regulated health professional 
acceptable to the College, who must carefully observe all of his examinations of female patients 
and remain in the examination or consulting room at all times during all professional encounters 
with female patients. The practice monitor is required to report on at least a monthly basis to the 
College. Dr. Wilson is required to post a sign regarding this restriction in his waiting room and 
all examination rooms, and there are various provisions to permit compliance monitoring.  
 
Dr. Wilson entered into this undertaking at the College’s request after the College received 
complaints about female patients’ experiences in Dr. Wilson’s office, including two instances in 
which Dr. Wilson moved the patient’s clothing aside and commenced an examination without 
adequate explanation or consent.  
 
In 2011, Dr. Wilson voluntarily completed a course offered by the University of Western Ontario 
on Understanding Boundary Issues and Managing the Risks Inherent in the Doctor-Patient 
Relationship.  
 
Dr. Wilson’s practice monitor has advised that she has not had concerns regarding his respect for 
female patients’ boundaries and privacy. 
 
The College has not received any complaints regarding conduct by Dr. Wilson towards female 
patients that has taken place since he entered into the 2012 undertaking. 
 
PENALTY 
 
On November 16, 2016, the Discipline Committee ordered and directed that: 
   -  the Registrar suspend Dr. Wilson’s certificate of registration for period of four (4) 
      months, to commence at 12:01 a.m. on November 17, 2016. 
   -  the Registrar impose the terms of Dr. Wilson’s undertaking with the College dated 
      January 13, 2012 as terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Wilson’s certificate of 
      registration.   
   -  Dr. Wilson appear before the panel to be reprimanded. 
   -  Dr. Wilson pay to the College its costs of this proceeding in the amount of $5,000.00 
      within thirty (30) days from the date of this Order.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): November 16, 2016