Wilson Smith, Kerri Dawn (CPSO#: 84437)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 May 2009

Summary

Former Name: Wilson, Kerri Dawn (used until: 16 Sep 2014 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
PO Box 3011
40 Goodall Street
Dryden ON  P8N 2Z6
Phone: (807) 223-6683
Electoral District: 09
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

58 Goodall St
Dryden ON  P8N 2Z6
Canada
Phone: (807) 223-8201
County: District of Kenora
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kerri Wilson Smith Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 26 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Wilson Smith ( CPSO# 84437 )

Business Address:
PO Box 3011
40 Goodall Street
Dryden ON  P8N 2Z6
Phone Number: (807) 223-6683

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Dryden Regional Health Centre Dryden

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KERRI DAWN WILSON SMITH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WILSON SMITH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Obstetrics)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 May 2009