Wilton, Kelly (CPSO#: 95883)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Oct 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto Sleep & Pulmonary Centre
123 Edward Street
Toronto ON  M5G1E2
Phone: 4168132277
Fax: 4162603203
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Ellesmere Sleep Disorders Centre
2100 Ellesmere Road, Suite 326
Scarborough ON  M1H 3B7
Canada
Phone: (416) 439-0130
Fax: (416) 439-5508
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Toronto East General Hospital
Division of Respirology
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Canada
Phone: 4164696580
Fax: 4164696554
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kelly Wilton Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 25 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Wilton ( CPSO# 95883 )

Business Address:
Toronto Sleep and Pulmonary Centre
123 Edward Street
Toronto ON  M5G 1E2
Phone Number: (416) 813-2277

Business Address:
Toronto East General Hospital
Division of Respirology
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Phone Number: (416) 469-6580

Business Address:
Ellesmere Sleep Disorders Centre
326-2100 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1H 3B7
Phone Number: (416) 439-0130

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 31 Oct 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KELLY WILTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WILTON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 31 Dec 2017
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Oct 2015