Wimmer, Curt Juergen (CPSO#: 94455)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Oct 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 01 Oct 2010

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Wayne State University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1083 Ouellette
Windsor ON  N9A 4J8
Phone: (519) 915-7125
Fax: (519) 962-3339
Electoral District: 01
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

194 Talbot Street W
Leamington ON  N8H 1N9
Canada
Phone: 519-326-2373
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01

22101 Morross
Detroit MI  48236
United States
Phone: 313-343-4000
County: 
Electoral District: 
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Curt Wimmer Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 24 2014


Corporation Name: Dr. Curt Wimmer Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 13 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Wimmer ( CPSO# 94455 )
Dr. M. Narewal ( CPSO# 81393 )

Business Address:
InMedic
Suite 4
13158 Tecumseh Road East
Tecumseh ON  N8N 3T6
Phone Number: (519) 948-0768

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Erie Shores HealthCare Leamington

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 01 Oct 2010 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2010
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Oct 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Mar 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 16 Mar 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 17 May 2012
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 17 May 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 13 Sep 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 13 Sep 2018 Active View Details [+]
            Dr. Curt Juergen Wimmer may practice medicine independently in Emergency
            Medicine and Pain Medicine, only.