Win, Lay Lay (CPSO#: 85146)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Nov 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Burmese, English

Education:Mandalay Institute of Medicine, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 301
40 Holly Street
Toronto ON  M4S 3C3
Phone: (416) 486 8088
Fax: 416 486 7888
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 301
1366 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4T 3A7
Canada
Phone: (416) 926 0262
Fax: 416 926 0936
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Win Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 14 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Win ( CPSO# 85146 )

Business Address:
Suite 301
1366 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4T 3A7
Phone Number: (416) 926-0262

Business Address:
301 - 40 Holly Street
Toronto ON  M4S 3C3
Phone Number: (416) 486-8088

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 18 Oct 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LAY LAY WIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Nov 2010