Windram, Jonathan David (CPSO#: 92356)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Nov 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Nov 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Glasgow, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2010 to 18 Mar 2010
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 19 Mar 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Dec 2012
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 04 Jan 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Mar 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Nov 2012