Wintersperger, Bernd Juergen (CPSO#: 92681)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Apr 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 26 Apr 2010

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, German

Education:Ludwig Maximilian University at Munich, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Department of Medical Imaging
1 PMB 273
585 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2N2
Phone: (416) 340-4800 Ext. 8593
Fax: (416) 340-3900
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: White Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 11 2017


Corporation Name: Wintersperger Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 08 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Wintersperger ( CPSO# 92681 )

Business Address:
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Department of Medical Imaging
1 PMB 273
585 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2N2
Phone Number: (416) 340-4800

Business Address:
Unit 3-974
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone Number: (416) 946-2000

Business Address:
3MC410
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-5800

Business Address:
12th Floor
Breast Imaging
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: (416) 586-4800

Business Address:
76 Grenville Street
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Phone Number: (416) 323-6400

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Germany

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Rehabilitation Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 26 Apr 2010 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 26 Apr 2010
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 26 Apr 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 28 Feb 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 06 Nov 2013
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 06 Nov 2013

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 06 Nov 2013 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Bernd Juergen Wintersperger may practise medicine only,

                  (a)   in  a  setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medical
                        Imaging, University of Toronto, in which Dr. Wintersperger holds an
                        academic appointment at the rank of Associate Professor, and
                  
                  (b)   in accordance with the requirements of his appointment.
                  
            2.    The  certificate   of   registration   automatically   expires  when  Dr.
                  Wintersperger no longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.