Wise, Yishai Avraham (CPSO#: 77844)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 101
377 Church Street
Markham ON  L6B 1A1
Phone: (905) 471-9999
Fax: (905) 471-3627
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Yishai Wise Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 13 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Wise ( CPSO# 77844 )
Dr. V. Weinstock ( CPSO# 72552 )

Business Address:
Suite 101
377 Church Street
Markham ON  L6B 1A1
Phone Number: (905) 471-9999

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 07 Jun 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. YISHAI AVRAHAM WISE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WISE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 31 Oct 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Nov 2005 to 30 Apr 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 May 2006 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 May 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 May 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 2007