Witt, Jonathan Derek (CPSO#: 95625)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 May 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 May 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
West Parry Sound Health Centre
6 Albert Street
Parry Sound ON  P2A 3A4
Phone: (705) 746-9321
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Witt Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 28 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Witt ( CPSO# 95625 )
Dr. A. Witt ( CPSO# 88730 )

Business Address:
West Parry Sound Health Centre
6 Albert Street
Parry Sound ON  P2A 3A4
Phone Number: (705) 746-9321

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
West Parry Sound Health Centre Parry Sound

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Dec 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JONATHAN DEREK WITT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WITT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 19 Nov 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 20 Nov 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 18 Nov 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 Nov 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 May 2014