Wiwcharuk, Gillian Lynne (CPSO#: 88657)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Spanish

Education:McMaster University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Shelter Health Network
128 Emerald St South
Hamilton ON  L8N 2V5
Phone: (905) 526-7137
Fax: (905) 526-7969
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Brantford General Hospital
200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford ON  N3R 1G9
Canada
Phone: (519) 751-5858
County: County of Brant
Electoral District: 04

The Hamilton Clinic
First Pilgrim United Church
200 Main St E, lower level
Hamilton ON  L8N 1H3
Canada
Phone: (905) 523-4567
Fax: (905) 523-4533
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Gillian Wiwcharuk Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 17 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Wiwcharuk ( CPSO# 88657 )

Business Address:
Brantford Comm Healthcare System
Department of Emergency Medicine
200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford ON  N3R 1G9
Phone Number: (519) 751-5858

Business Address:
Shelter Health Network
128 Emerald Street South
Hamilton ON  L8N 2V5
Phone Number: (905) 526-7137

Business Address:
200 Main Street East
Hamilton ON  L8N 1H3
Phone Number: (905) 523-4567

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
Brant Community Healthcare System,Willett Site Paris
Muskoka Algonquin Health Care,South Muskoka Memorial Site Bracebridge
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 19 Oct 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GILLIAN LYNNE WIWCHARUK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WIWCHARUK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 21 Apr 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Apr 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 21 Apr 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 2011