Wohlgemut, Joel Rainer Pauls (CPSO#: 76119)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: Pauls Wohlgemut, Joel Rainer (used until: 10 Oct 2006 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
29 Noxon Street
Ingersoll ON  N5C 3V6
Phone: (519) 425-9000
Fax: (519) 485-9609
Electoral District: 02
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Alexandra Hospital
29 Noxon Street
Ingersoll ON  N5C 3V6
Canada
Phone: (519) 485-1700
County: County of Oxford
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Joel Wohlgemut Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 16 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Wohlgemut ( CPSO# 76119 )

Business Address:
Alexandra Family Physicians
29 Noxon Street
Ingersoll ON  N5C 3V6
Phone Number: (519) 425-9000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Alexandra Hospital Ingersoll

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 2003 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOEL RAINER PAULS WOHLGEMUT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WOHLGEMUT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2003