Wojcik, John Paul (CPSO#: 72547)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Jul 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 207
450 Central Avenue
London ON  N6B 2E8
Phone: (519) 435-0063
Fax: (519) 435-0184
Electoral District: 02

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
Kincardine and District Site,South Bruce Grey Health Kincardine

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN PAUL WOJCIK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WOJCIK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 2002