Wojtowicz, Jeremy Michael (CPSO#: 87862)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Mar 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Mar 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hamilton General Hospital
Room 2 14
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 46368
Fax: (905) 527-7051
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Henderson Hospital
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Canada
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 46368
Fax: (905) 528-0152
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

Main Street West Urgent Care Centre
690 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 1A4
Canada
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 46368
Fax: (905) 528-0152
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. Wojtowicz Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 10 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Wojtowicz ( CPSO# 87862 )

Business Address:
690 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 1A4
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
Hamilton General Hospital
Room 2-14
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
Henderson General Hospital
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JEREMY MICHAEL WOJTOWICZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WOJTOWICZ is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 19 Nov 2007 to 16 Dec 2007
Elective Trainee - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Nov 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Dec 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Mar 2008