Wolf, Michael Uri (CPSO#: 83084)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Baycrest Centre for Geriatric Care
Kimel Family Building 6th floor
3560 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M6A 2E1
Phone: (416) 785-2500 Ext. 2521
Fax: (416) 785-2484
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 302
2788 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M6B 3A3
Canada
Phone: (416) 785-2500 Ext. 2521
Fax: (416) 850-5361
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. M.U. Wolf Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 15 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Wolf ( CPSO# 83084 )

Business Address:
Suite 302
2788 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M6B 3A3
Phone Number: (416) 785-2500

Business Address:
Baycrest Centre for Geriatric Care
Brain Health Complex Room 4W02
3560 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M6A 2E1
Phone Number: (416) 785-2000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Baycrest Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist
Geriatric Psychiatry Effective: 21 Sep 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL URI WOLF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WOLF is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2010