Wolfson, Nikolay (CPSO#: 57933)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Oct 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Sep 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew, Russian

Education:Tel Aviv University, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2300 Sutter Street, Suite 207
San Francisco CA  94115
United States
Phone: (415) 221-4400
Fax: 415-798-2213
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

935 Trancas Street, Suite 3B
California
Napa CA  94558
United States
Phone: 415-221-4400
Fax: 415-798-2213
County: 
Electoral District: 

2 Champagne
Unit B-11
North York ON  M3J 2C5
Canada
Phone: 4164771101
Fax: 8007087768
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - California
USA - West Virginia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 19 Nov 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NIKOLAY WOLFSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WOLFSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Mar 1987
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1987
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Oct 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Sep 1990