Wolfson, Robert Matthew (CPSO#: 86607)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Medical Imaging
2075 Bayview Avenue, Room AG-13b
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-6100 Ext. 5731
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Christakis Arenson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 29 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Jimenez Juan ( CPSO# 87503 )
Dr. C. Heyn ( CPSO# 88810 )
Dr. H. Ghandehari ( CPSO# 84625 )
Dr. P. Jabehdar Maralani ( CPSO# 84825 )
Dr. L. Milot ( CPSO# 86997 )
Dr. C. Dey ( CPSO# 94397 )
Dr. M. Skarpathiotakis ( CPSO# 84703 )
Dr. R. Yeung ( CPSO# 83681 )
Dr. J. Wall ( CPSO# 57057 )
Dr. S. Symons ( CPSO# 69225 )
Dr. J. Sarrazin ( CPSO# 66362 )
Dr. J. Rubenstein ( CPSO# 29908 )
Dr. L. Richmond ( CPSO# 81154 )
Dr. R. Pugash ( CPSO# 53910 )
Dr. L. Probyn ( CPSO# 73373 )
Dr. A. Oikonomou ( CPSO# 76829 )
Dr. A. Moody ( CPSO# 63017 )
Dr. C. McGregor ( CPSO# 70337 )
Dr. E. Martinovic ( CPSO# 76031 )
Dr. R. Jong ( CPSO# 23271 )
Dr. P. Howard ( CPSO# 74992 )
Dr. P. Hamilton ( CPSO# 55254 )
Dr. K. Hack ( CPSO# 81145 )
Dr. P. Glanc ( CPSO# 55972 )
Dr. E. David ( CPSO# 71504 )
Dr. A. Arenson ( CPSO# 32995 )
Dr. R. Aviv ( CPSO# 78068 )
Dr. C. Betel ( CPSO# 73485 )
Dr. M. Christakis ( CPSO# 62099 )
Dr. N. Curpen ( CPSO# 78380 )
Dr. R. Wolfson ( CPSO# 86607 )
Dr. M. Machnowska ( CPSO# 92153 )
Dr. C. Patel ( CPSO# 96861 )
Dr. F. Berger ( CPSO# 110670)

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Room MG100
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-5862


Corporation Name: Dr. Robert M. Wolfson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 21 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Wolfson ( CPSO# 86607 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Medical Imaging
Room AG-13(A)
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-6100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Nuclear Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT MATTHEW WOLFSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WOLFSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Nuclear Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Nuclear Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Nuclear Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nuclear Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nuclear Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Nuclear Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2012