Wolfstadt, Jesse Isaac (CPSO#: 95726)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
600 University Avenue
Suite 476C
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 586-4800 Ext. 2835
Fax: (416) 586-8678
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. I. Wolfstadt Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 22 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Wolfstadt ( CPSO# 95726 )

Business Address:
476C-600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: (416) 586-4800

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JESSE ISAAC WOLFSTADT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WOLFSTADT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 31 Dec 2017
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016