Wolski, Winicjusz Marek (CPSO#: 84726)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Sep 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:University of Toronto, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 508
2300 Eglinton Ave West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2V8
Phone: (905) 608-2424
Fax: (905) 608-2992
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: W.M. Wolski Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 21 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Wolski ( CPSO# 84726 )

Business Address:
Suite 508
2300 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2V8
Phone Number: (905) 608-2424

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 04 Oct 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WINICJUSZ MAREK WOLSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WOLSKI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Sep 2010