Wong, Ben Chun-Tung (CPSO#: 90516)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Sep 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Sep 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Headwaters Health Care Centre
100 Rolling Hills Drive
Orangeville ON  L9W 4X9
Phone: (519) 941-2410 Ext. 2220
Fax: 226-916-0550
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: B.C. Wong Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 27 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Wong ( CPSO# 90516 )

Business Address:
Headwaters Health Centre
100 Rolling Hills Drive
Orangeville ON  L9W 4X9
Phone Number: (519) 941-2410

Business Address:
Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone Number: (905) 494-2120

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Headwaters Health Care Centre,Orangeville-Dufferin Site Orangeville
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 26 Sep 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BEN CHUN-TUNG WONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WONG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 2009 to 10 Jul 2009
Elective Trainee - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 16 Jan 2012 to 10 Feb 2012
Elective Trainee - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 10 Jul 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jan 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 10 Feb 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Sep 2014