Wong, Bertha (CPSO#: 95962)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 May 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:University of Toronto, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 723
115 Humber College Blvd
Etobicoke ON  M9V 0A9
Phone: 647-351-1115
Fax: 647-351-7842
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

6175 Highway 7
Units 19-22
Vaughan ON  L4H 0P6
Canada
Phone: 416-297-8362
Fax: 416-840-8434
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 27 Sep 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BERTHA WONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WONG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 May 2016