Wong, Cynthia Sau-Yin (CPSO#: 61111)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:University of Toronto, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Cynthia Wong Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 16 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Wong ( CPSO# 61111 )

Business Address:
No business address available

Medical Records Location

Address: Docudavit Solutions 28 Eugene St North York ON M6B 3Z4
Date Received: 15 Jan 2019

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CYNTHIA SAU-YIN WONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WONG is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Jun 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1990