Wong, Deborah Joanne (CPSO#: 95262)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Alliston Family Health Team
36 Victoria Street West
Alliston ON  L9R 1S8
Phone: (705) 435-8887
Fax: (705) 435-8867
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Deborah Wong Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 14 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Wong ( CPSO# 95262 )

Business Address:
Alliston Family Health Team
36 Victoria Street West
Alliston ON  L9R 1S8
Phone Number: (705) 435-8887

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 26 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DEBORAH JOANNE WONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WONG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2013