Wong, Denise Wing-Yee (CPSO#: 93178)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 305
250 Dundas Street West
Toronto ON  M5T 2Z5
Phone: (416) 217-3931
Fax: (416) 217-1161
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 302
790 Bay Street
Toronto ON  M5G 1N8
Canada
Phone: (416) 585-9555
Fax: (416) 585-5815
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

1651 Keele Street
Toronto ON  M6M 3W2
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Denise W. Wong Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 16 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Wong ( CPSO# 28387 )
Dr. D. Wong ( CPSO# 93178 )

Business Address:
305 - 250 Dundas Steert West
Toronto ON  M5T 2Z5
Phone Number: (416) 217-3931

Business Address:
302 - 790 Bay Street
Toronto ON  M5G 1N8
Phone Number: (416) 585-9555

Business Address:
1651 Keele Street
Toronto ON  M6M 3W2
Phone Number: (416) 653-5400

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Wilson Memorial General Hospital Marathon

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DENISE WING-YEE WONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WONG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2012