Wong, Derek Ti Hsin (CPSO#: 80375)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Apr 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Children's Hospital of Eastern ON
Room 3317
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600 Ext. 2390
Fax: (613) 738-4835
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Derek T.H. Wong Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 25 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Wong ( CPSO# 80375 )

Business Address:
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
Room 3317
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone Number: (613) 737-7600

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 16 Oct 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DEREK TI HSIN WONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WONG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 12 Jan 2004 to 09 Feb 2004
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 6 - Paediatric Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jan 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 09 Feb 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Apr 2008