Wong, Edward Huntington (CPSO#: 74280)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 15 Apr 2002

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 15 Apr 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Auckland, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2001 to 15 Apr 2002
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Sep 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 10 Aug 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 10 Aug 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Apr 2002