Wong, Gail Kwei-Mun (CPSO#: 84023)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Dec 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 01 Dec 2007

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of New South Wales, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Children's Hospital Westmead
Hawkesbury Road
Westmead 2145
Westmead 2145
Australia
Phone: +61 2 9845 000

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Australia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 01 Dec 2007 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 31 Jan 2006 to 15 Mar 2006
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 16 Mar 2006 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Nov 2007
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 31 Jan 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Mar 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Nov 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Dec 2007
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 10 Mar 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Nov 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 29 Aug 2013
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 29 Aug 2013

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 29 Aug 2013 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.  Gail Kwei-Mun Wong may practise medicine independently in anaesthesiology,
            only.