Wong, Garway Matthew Victor (CPSO#: 89026)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
36 King St.
Brantford ON  N3T 3C5
Phone: (519) 752-4340
Fax: (519) 752-6096
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

18 Centre St.
Thornhill ON  L4J 1E9
Canada
Phone: (905) 889-3634
Fax: (905) 889-3986
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Wong & Ho Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 02 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Ho ( CPSO# 92897 )
Dr. G. Wong ( CPSO# 89026 )

Business Address:
36 King Street
Brantford ON  N3T 3C5
Phone Number: (519) 752-4340

Business Address:
18 Centre Street
Thornhill ON  L4J 1E9
Phone Number: (905) 889-3634

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GARWAY MATTHEW VICTOR WONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WONG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2010