Wong, Harvey Hoi-Wai (CPSO#: 82602)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:McMaster University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Room A459
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-4758
Fax: (416) 480-5153
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

St Michael's Hospital
Room 6044 Bond Wing
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Canada
Phone: (416) 864-6056
Fax: (416) 864-5649
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Harvey H. Wong Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 09 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Lee ( CPSO# 89828 )
Dr. H. Wong ( CPSO# 82602 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Room A459
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-4758

Business Address:
St Michaels Hospital
Bond Wing
Room 6044
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-6059

Business Address:
396 St. Claire Avenue West
Toronto ON  M5P 3N3
Phone Number: (416) 928-9343

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 28 Sep 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HARVEY HOI-WAI WONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WONG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respiratory Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Dec 2010 to 31 Mar 2011
Clinical Fellow - Respirology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 01 Aug 2011
Clinical Fellow - Respirology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2009