Wong, Hubert Ming Chee (CPSO#: 74750)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Oct 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Scarborough Centenary Hospital
2867 Ellesmere Road
Toronto ON  M1E 4B9
Phone: (416) 284-8131 Ext. 7476
Fax: 4162817313
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Hubert M. C. Wong Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 17 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Wong ( CPSO# 74750 )

Business Address:
2867 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1E 4B9
Phone Number: (416) 284-8131

Business Address:
3030 Birchmount Street
Toronto ON  M1W 3W3
Phone Number: (416) 284-8131

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 14 Sep 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HUBERT MING CHEE WONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WONG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Nephrology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Oct 2004