Wong, Jason Chun-Hang (CPSO#: 79182)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Mar 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Mar 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English, Mandarin

Education:Queen's University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Princess Margaret Hospital
Department of Radiation Oncology
610 University Ave.
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone: 9058954521 Ext. 6595
Fax: (905) 952-2818
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Southlake/Stronach Cancer Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  M5G 2M9
Canada
Phone: (905) 895-4521 Ext. 6595
Fax: (905) 952-2818
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. JC Wong Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 18 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Wong ( CPSO# 79182 )

Business Address:
Princess Margaret Hospital
Department of Radiaiton Oncology
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone Number: (416) 946-4501

Business Address:
Southlake/Stronach Cancer Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone Number: (905) 895-4521

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - California

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JASON CHUN-HANG WONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WONG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Mar 2013