Wong, Jason Hon Pun (CPSO#: 67730)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jul 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:Queen's University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Court Medical Offices
Suite 314
2863 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1E 5E9
Phone: (416) 287-8303
Fax: (416) 287-3239
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

330 Highway 7 East
Richmond Hill ON  L4B 3P1
Canada
Phone: (905) 707-5007
Fax: (905) 707-5008
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

9019 Bayview Avenue
Unit 5-6
Richmond Hill ON  L4B 3M6
Canada
Phone: (905) 886-1110
Fax: (905) 886-9996
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jason H. P. Wong Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 23 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Wong ( CPSO# 67730 )

Business Address:
The Court Medical Offices
Suite 314
2863 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1E 5E9
Phone Number: (416) 287-8303

Business Address:
9019 Bayview Avenue
Suite 6
Richmond Hill ON  L4B 3M6
Phone Number: (905) 886-1110

Business Address:
510 - 330 Highway 7 East
Richmond Hill ON  L4B 3P8
Phone Number: (905) 707-5007

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JASON HON PUN WONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WONG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 1999