Wong, Jorge Alfredo (CPSO#: 84428)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:McMaster University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
DBCVSRI C3-11D
Hamilton General Hospital
237 Barton St. East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone: (905)521-2100 Ext. 40309
Fax: (905)297-3785
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Drs. Y. Zhao & J. Wong Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 08 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Wong ( CPSO# 84428 )
Dr. Y. Zhao ( CPSO# 88379 )

Business Address:
Hamilton General Hospital
DBCVSRI C3 - 13C
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
55 Frid Street
Suite 7
Hamilton ON  L8P 4M3
Phone Number: (905) 529-2259

Business Address:
1835 Yonge Street
Suite 303
Toronto ON  M4S 1X8
Phone Number: (416) 792-9436

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 10 Oct 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JORGE ALFREDO WONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WONG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2010