Wong, Joyce Wendy (CPSO#: 94454)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 22 Sep 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 22 Sep 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Alberta, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 27 Sep 2010 to 24 Oct 2010
Elective Trainee - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 06 May 2013 to 02 Jun 2013
Elective Trainee - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 26 Aug 2013 to 22 Sep 2013
Elective Trainee - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Sep 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 24 Oct 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 May 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 02 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Aug 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Sep 2013