Wong, Kenny K (CPSO#: 75853)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 09 Feb 2001

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 09 Feb 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Alberta, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 19 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 08 Sep 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jan 2001 to 09 Feb 2001
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jan 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 09 Feb 2001