Wong, Kwok Sum Rebecca (CPSO#: 55966)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Nov 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:University of Sheffield, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Princess Margaret Cancer Center
Department of Radiation Oncology
5th Floor
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone: (416) 946-2132
Fax: (416) 946-6561
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Rebecca K.S. Wong Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 12 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Wong ( CPSO# 55966 )

Business Address:
Princess Margaret Hospital
Department of Radiation Oncology
5th Floor
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone Number: (416) 946-2126

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 15 Nov 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KWOK SUM REBECCA WONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WONG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1990 to 30 Jun 1990
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Nov 1985